FL S1108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising registration fees for moving brokers, etc.
Title
Fees/Moving Brokers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-28 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1106 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy
H1525 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1523 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1525 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1523 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee