FL S1106 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145), HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145), HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing enhanced criminal penalties for soliciting another to commit prostitution and similar offenses; providing for impoundment of a vehicle used in soliciting another to commit prostitution and similar offenses; requiring a judge to allow an advocate to be present with a human trafficking victim in an expunction hearing in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145), HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 465 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1108 (Related) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
S1110 (Related) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147), CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
H0465 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-145, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
H0467 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-146, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
H0469 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-147, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
S1110 (Related) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147), CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
H0465 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-145, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
H0467 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-146, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
H0469 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-147, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |