FL S1104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation to consist of a central office that establishes policies and procedures and districts that carry out projects as authorized or required under the policies and procedures of the central office; deleting a provision relating to prohibitions on certain vehicles following other vehicles within 300 feet; authorizing a mobile carrier to operate on sidewalks and crosswalks; revising regulations to which owners and drivers of commercial motor vehicles are subject; authorizing the Florida Turnpike Enterprise to fund, construct, and operate test facilities for the advancement of autonomous and connected innovative transportation technology solutions for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn Messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-09SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted (305832)
2018-03-09SenateAmendment(s) failed (305832)
2018-03-09SenateAmendment(s) adopted (414952, 501640, 690332, 758604) 976
2018-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-03-06SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-22SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-18SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1414 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H353 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1357 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S504 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 215
S712 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H909 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H883 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H141 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-145
H1263 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S554 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1050 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H215 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-130

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/905658/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/331456/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/621258/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/867304/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/562916/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/470080/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/647322/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/758604/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/501640/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/414952/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/305832/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Amendment/690332/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1104/Vote/SenateVote_s01104c2003.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback