FL S1102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a landlord from evicting a tenant or terminating a rental agreement because the tenant or the tenant's minor child is a victim of actual or threatened domestic violence, dating violence, sexual violence, or stalking; authorizing a victim of such actual or threatened violence or stalking to terminate a rental agreement under certain circumstances; requiring certain documentation and written notice to the landlord; providing for liability for rent for both the tenant and the perpetrator, if applicable; requiring a landlord to change the locks of a dwelling unit within a specified timeframe under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Early Termination of Rental Agreement by a Crime Victim
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H393 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1102 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1102/BillText/Filed/HTML |