FL S1100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that specified exemptions apply to licensed and unlicensed veterinary technicians; providing requirements for the licensure of veterinary technicians; providing continuing education requirements for the renewal of licensed veterinary technicians' licenses; providing grounds for disciplinary actions against applicants for licensure and licensed veterinary technicians, etc.
Title
Practice of Veterinary Medicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Agriculture; Rules |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1102 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
H261 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H263 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H303 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Chapter No. 2024-258
S334 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 303
S1162 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
H261 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H263 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H303 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Chapter No. 2024-258
S334 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 303
S1162 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
474 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 2071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1100 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1100/BillText/Filed/HTML |