FL S1096 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a retiree of the Florida Retirement System to be reemployed under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Reemployment After Retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H631 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1096 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1096/BillText/Filed/HTML |