FL S1096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631; Amendment(s) adopted (672830) -SJ 00631; Substituted CS/HB 105 -SJ 00631; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2010-48) -SJ 00631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631; Amendment(s) adopted (672830) -SJ 00631; Substituted CS/HB 105 -SJ 00631; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2010-48) -SJ 00631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Justice Sandra Day O'Connor Civics Education Act." Amends a specified provision relating to the Sunshine State Standards. Provides requirements for a civics education course that a student must successfully complete for middle grades promotion beginning with students entering grade 6 in the 2012-2013 school year. Provides requirements for course grade and course credit for subsequent school years, etc.
Title
Middle School Civics Education Assessment [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631; Amendment(s) adopted (672830) -SJ 00631; Substituted CS/HB 105 -SJ 00631; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2010-48) -SJ 00631 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00078; On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 02/16/10, 4:00 pm, 301-S; CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00159; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00164 | |
2010-03-01 | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-16 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-05 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 02/16/10, 4:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2010-01-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0105 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |