FL S1094 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising penalties applicable to employers who fail to secure the payment of workers' compensation as required, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 01/26/12, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-20 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-01-20 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 268 | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Budget -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 88 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 88 | |
2011-11-30 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1094 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1094/BillText/Filed/HTML |