FL S1090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting the 2022 version of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of the state corporate income tax code; providing for retroactive operation; providing applicability for adjustments taxpayers must make to adjusted federal income with respect to bonus depreciation; revising the adjustments taxpayers must make to adjusted federal income with respect to business interest, etc.
Title
Corporate Income Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7071 (Similar To) 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-97
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |