FL S1090 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "small technology company"; authorizing the provision of loans to small technology companies through the Microfinance Guarantee Program, etc.
Title
Economic Incentives for Small Technology Companies
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 9931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1090 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1090/BillText/Filed/HTML |