FL S1088 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a judicial officer or an immediate family member of a judicial officer to request the removal of his or her personal identifying information from the Internet in a specified manner; prohibiting such information from being reposted or transferred to another person; authorizing a judicial officer or the immediate family member of a judicial officer to bring an action seeking certain relief; authorizing a court to award certain damages, court costs, and attorney fees, etc.
Title
Personal Information of Judicial Officers and Their Family Members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H409 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1088 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1088/BillText/Filed/HTML |