FL S1088 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "mental injury" with respect to the offenses of abuse, aggravated abuse, and neglect of a child. Requires that a person acting as an expert witness have certain credentials. Conforms cross-references. Redefines the term "crime" for purposes of crime victims compensation to include additional forms of injury. Redefines the term "victim" to conform with the modified definition of the term "crime."
Title
Criminal Conduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Criminal Justice (598956); YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-24 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 81 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 81 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0705 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
827 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |