FL S1086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing proper venue in a county where defamatory material was accessed by a third party; providing that publication of certain media forms the basis of a defamation action; designating the "Protection of Public Figures from False Narratives and Defamation Law"; prohibiting journalists and media outlets from knowingly publishing or disseminating a false narrative or defamatory material about a public figure; providing an alternative standard of proof for actions where the defendant does not identify the source of the defamatory material or when the defamatory action is unrelated to a plaintiff's status as a public figure, etc.
Title
Defamation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H757 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1780 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S1780 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1086 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1086/BillText/Filed/HTML |