FL S1086 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to provide tax collectors and their approved agents and vendors with real-time access to certain vehicle and vessel registration data and functionality in the same manner as provided to other third parties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle and Vessel Registration Data and Functionality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-27SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-12-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H571 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32873Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback