FL S1080 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the consideration of the residential addresses of certain persons during the district-drawing process for boards of county commissioners; requiring municipalities to fix the boundaries of their districts in a certain manner; specifying that district changes may be made only in odd-numbered years; prohibiting the consideration of the residential addresses of certain persons during the residence-area-drawing process for district school boards, etc.
Title
Local Redistricting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7069 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S444 (Similar To) 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101)
H411 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-101
S444 (Similar To) 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101)
H411 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-101
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
124 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |