FL S1080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating "Andrew's Law"; expanding the crime of hazing, a third degree felony, to include when a person solicits others to commit or is actively involved in the planning of hazing; expanding the crime of hazing, a first degree misdemeanor, to include when a person solicits others to commit or is actively involved in the planning of hazing; providing immunity from prosecution to persons who meet specified requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#299 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-02SenateConcurred in 2 amendment(s) (042329, 804309)
2019-04-30SenateIn returning messages
2019-04-30HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) adopted (042329, 804309)
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HouseReceived
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-23HouseIn Messages
2019-04-23SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-15SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-11SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-02SenateCS/CS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-28SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS/CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Education
2019-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Education; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H727 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table -- Companion bill SB 1080 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100663Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Amendment/361142/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Amendment/472838/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Amendment/042329/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Amendment/804309/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Vote/SenateVote_s01080c3004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Vote/HouseVote_s01080c3299.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1080/Vote/SenateVote_s01080c3028.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback