FL S1080 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that specified eligibility requirements do not apply to students in certain grades beginning in a specified school year; revising student eligibility criteria; providing for the calculation of the scholarship amount for students diagnosed with a disability by certain physicians or psychologists; providing for the adjustment of the scholarship amount under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John M. McKay Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-12-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H829 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100239Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback