FL S1080 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a legislative finding that not all capital collateral cases are extraordinary or unusual. Requires that regional counsel report to and serve at the pleasure of the Commission on Capital Cases. Revises the criteria required for an attorney to be eligible to be placed on the registry of attorneys qualified to represent defendants in postconviction capital collateral proceedings, etc.
Title
Capital Collateral Representation [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00077 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0027 | 7001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 7002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |