FL S1076 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Protect Florida Small Business Act"; prohibiting a franchisor from terminating or not renewing a franchise under certain circumstances; prohibiting a franchisor from denying certain persons the opportunity to participate in the ownership of a franchise for a specified period after the death of the franchisee or the death of a person controlling a majority interest in the franchise; requiring a franchisor and a franchisee to deal with each other in good faith; prohibiting waivers through certain contract provisions that would affect a person's rights to make a claim, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franchises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-31SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/30/18, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1219 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
686101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
686109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817416Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback