FL S1076 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Restoring Faith in Public Office Act." Provides that it is a third-degree felony for a public servant, with corrupt intent, to fail to disclose certain direct or indirect financial interests or benefits. Provides that it is a third-degree felony for a public servant, with corrupt intent, to fail to disclose a fact or information concerning an official act which is required to be disclosed by law, etc.
Title
Public Servants [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00650; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00650 | |
2010-04-15 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00551; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/19/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-12 | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00556 | |
2010-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 04/12/10, 3:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00076 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-01-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0585 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S0902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167), HB 1301 (Ch. 2010-112)
S0902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167), HB 1301 (Ch. 2010-112)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0838 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |