FL S1074 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 879
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 879
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the surviving spouses of certain permanently disabled veterans to carry over a certain discount on ad valorem taxes on homestead property under specified conditions; authorizing the discount to be transferred to another permanent residence under specified conditions; authorizing the Department of Revenue to adopt emergency rules, etc.
Title
Surviving Spouse Ad Valorem Tax Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 879 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted HB 879 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1076 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877
H879 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-179, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 877 (Passed)
H877 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
H879 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-179, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 877 (Passed)
H877 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |