FL S1070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 717
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 717
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying that Space Florida is subject to a specified provision of law; revising Space Florida's authorization to issue bonds; revising the revenue sources by which revenue bonds may be secured or repaid; revising the term "expanded" to "expended" to clarify the authority of the governing body of Space Florida; reducing the term of years for which Space Florida may issue bonds, etc.
Title
Space Florida
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs and Space Committee | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 717 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 717 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H717 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-105
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
331 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 346 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |