FL S1068 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "crime" to include the commission of certain lewd or lascivious offenses; increasing the maximum amount the Crime Victims' Services Office of the Department of Legal Affairs is required to pay for certain medical expenses of victims of specified crimes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime Victim Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-03-11SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H785 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
96003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback