FL S1066 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn Messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H171 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback