FL S1060 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to defamation by falsely and maliciously imputing a woman's want of chastity and relating to defamation by making certain derogatory statements concerning banks and building and loan associations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defamation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-23SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2017-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6019 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
83604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83606Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback