FL S1048 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a church, a synagogue, or other religious institution to allow a concealed weapons or concealed firearms licensee to carry a concealed handgun in certain established physical places of worship under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 5
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-29SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1419 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback