FL S1046 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Trust Fund for Victims of Human Trafficking and Prevention within the Department of Law Enforcement; authorizing the department to contract with certain entities, subject to availability of funds and appropriations; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Fund for Victims of Human Trafficking and Prevention/Department of Law Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-12SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2017-12-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1044 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H169 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S342 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H167 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S338 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7870611Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback