FL S1044 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision relating to a list of persons who may not be issued a license plate, revalidation sticker, or replacement license plate for failure to surrender a vehicle pursuant to notice provided by a lienor; directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to withhold renewal of registration and replacement registration of vehicles; providing for a court order to remove a person's name from such list; requiring the notice to surrender a vehicle to be signed under oath by the lienor, etc.
Title
Liens on Motor Vehicles and Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0925 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 1316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1044 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1044/BillText/Filed/HTML |