FL S1038 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Energy 2040 Task Force within the Public Service Commission; requiring the task force to make recommendations, giving consideration to certain topics; specifying that the task force and any advisory committee members will serve without compensation, but are entitled to per diem and travel expenses, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy 2040 Task Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-11SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1586 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1411 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback