FL S1038 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reenacting, amending, and repealing provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; correcting grammatical, typographical, and like errors, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#478 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Chapter No. 2016-10 | |
2016-02-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-02-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-01-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-26 | House | Substituted for HB 7049 |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16 |
2016-01-21 | House | Received |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-01-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/21/16 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/14/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7049 (Same As) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1038 (Ch. 2016-10)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 56065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 362 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
153 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 0532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
238 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
272 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
333 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 41492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
610 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 01301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
618 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
625 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
752 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 2038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 4731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |