FL S1036 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the task force within the Department of Health for a specified purpose; requiring the department to provide administrative and technical assistance to the task force; requiring state agencies to assist and cooperate with the task force under certain circumstances; requiring the task force to submit a final report to the Governor, the Legislature, the State Surgeon General, and the director of the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability by a specified date; providing for expiration of the task force, etc.
Title
Florida Family Caregiver Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1036 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1036/BillText/Filed/HTML |