FL S1036 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of each public airport that meets certain criteria to create a diesel exhaust fluid safety mitigation and exclusion plan for submission to the Department of Transportation; requiring the plan to be fully implemented by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diesel Exhaust Fluid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Environment and Natural Resources
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-19SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Environment and Natural Resources
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2019-11-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H569 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
330401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback