FL S1036 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the information required to be included in an application for renewal of registration of an employee organization; providing for the revocation of certification under certain conditions; requiring certain employee organizations to recertify as bargaining agents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H25 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447307Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback