FL S1034 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that insurance carrier representatives who attend circuit court mediation have specified settlement authority and the ability to immediately consult by specified means with persons having certain additional settlement authority; limiting the information that may be included in the mediator's report to the court, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mediation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1043 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44409Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback