FL S1032 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Health to establish a statewide, centralized registry of persons who have symptoms associated with ST-elevation myocardial infarctions (STEMI); requiring certain health care facilities to report to the registry specified data on the treatment of STEMI patients; providing immunity from liability, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STEMI Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1313 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3818175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback