FL S1032 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 503 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 503 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Department of Environmental Protection and the applicable water management district grant a general permit for the construction, alteration, and maintenance of certain surface water management systems; authorizing the construction of certain surface water management systems to proceed without further action by the department or the water management district; providing definitions for the terms "ballasted roof," "hardscape," "heat island effect," "low-sloped roof," "solar reflectance" or "reflectance," and "steeped-sloped roof"; providing standards for a thermal-efficient roof, etc.
Title
Thermal Efficiency Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 503 (Ch. | |
2012-02-01 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/06/12, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/30/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 85 | |
2011-12-08 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 85 | |
2011-11-18 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1032 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1032/BillText/Filed/HTML |