FL S1030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating public records exemptions for certain information contained in any record that pertains to a vessel title or vessel registration issued by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing exemptions from public records requirements for electronic mail addresses and cellular telephone numbers collected by the department; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing statements of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Vessel Title or Registration/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7001 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-48
S7022 (Similar To) 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001
H1007 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190712Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback