FL S1030 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-157, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1700 (Ch. 2014-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Compassionate Medical Cannabis Act of 2014"; authorizing specified physicians to order low-THC cannabis for use by specified patients; requiring the Department of Health to create a compassionate use registry; authorizing certain medical centers to conduct research on cannabidiol and low-THC cannabis; requiring the department to establish an Office of Compassionate Use, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#864 (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-17 Chapter No. 2014-157, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1700 (Ch. 2014-158)
2014-06-16 Approved by Governor
2014-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2014-05-02SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2014-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 9
2014-05-02SenateAmendment(s) failed (763484)
2014-05-02SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (329511)
2014-05-02SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed 1092
2014-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2014-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 7
2014-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2014-05-01HouseAmendment(s) adopted (252453)
2014-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2014-05-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2014-05-01HouseReceived
2014-04-28HouseIn Messages
2014-04-28SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3
2014-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2014-04-28SenateAmendment(s) failed (763484)
2014-04-28SenateRead 2nd time
2014-04-24SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2014-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14
2014-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2014-04-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2014-04-22SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2014-04-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2014-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2014-03-24SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2014-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2014-03-17SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2014-03-17SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2014-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2014-03-11SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2014-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/11/14, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2014-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0843 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died pending review of CS, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1030 (Ch. 2014-157), SB 1700 (Ch. 2014-158)
H0859 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1030 (Ch. 2014-157)
S0962 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1030 (Ch. 2014-157)
S1700 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-158, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1030 (Ch. 2014-157)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38530Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45660Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/480078/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/617332/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/379848/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/763484/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/846365/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/662179/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/676117/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/252453/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/623707/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/880587/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/248665/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/401099/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/329511/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/113418/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/816718/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/820862/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Amendment/550996/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Vote/SenateVote_s1030c2018.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Vote/HouseVote_s1030c2864.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1030/Vote/SenateVote_s1030c2024.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback