FL S1026 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring counties to develop a plan for implementing a text-to-911 system and have a system to receive E911 text messages by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Text-to-911 Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback