FL S1022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from operating a motor vehicle while dialing, or talking or listening on, a wireless communications device for the purpose of interpersonal communication or while using a wireless communications device to view or post an electronic message or initiate a command to the Internet; requiring the Department of Transportation to notify the motoring public about the Florida Ban on Handheld Wireless Communications While Driving Law, etc.
Title
Wireless Communications Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0929 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1022 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1022/BillText/Filed/HTML |