FL S1020 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Including an electronic order as a type of order construed as a sale made at a vendor's licensed place of business; authorizing a vendor to make certain deliveries in a third-party vehicle under certain circumstances; providing that the vehicles used to make such deliveries are subject to certain inspections and searches under certain circumstances; requiring that the recipient's identity and age be verified and documented at the time of delivery, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol Deliveries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 667
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 667
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-16SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-15SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2018-01-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-10SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-11-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H667 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-133

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56157Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback