FL S1020 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition for "related interest"; clarifying that an institution may impose a fee for the settlement of a check under certain circumstances; providing legislative intent, etc.
Title
Banking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/16/13, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1091 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
655 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |