FL S1012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that a certain person's voting rights, rather than civil rights, be restored before he or she is qualified to serve as a juror, etc.
Title
Jurors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1012 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1012/BillText/Filed/HTML |