FL S1010 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing a prohibition on the recognition of marriages entered into between persons of the same sex in this state, another state, or another jurisdiction, either domestic or foreign; removing a prohibition on giving effect to any public act, record, or judicial proceeding of another jurisdiction respecting a marriage or relationship not recognized in this state or a claim arising from such a marriage or relationship, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage Equality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-11-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6011 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1588 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
741212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback