FL S1006 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that a consumer representative appointed by the Governor to the Citizens Property Insurance Corporation's board of governors is not prohibited from practicing in a certain profession if required or permitted by law or ordinance, etc.
Title
Operations of Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Sen. Gwen Margolis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1087 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1087 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |