FL S1000 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a pedestrian crosswalk on a public highway, street, or road which is located at any point other than at an intersection with another public highway, street, or road to be controlled by traffic control signal devices and pedestrian control signals that conform to specified requirements; requiring, by a specified date, the entity with jurisdiction over a public highway, street, or road with a certain pedestrian crosswalk to ensure that the crosswalk is controlled by coordinated traffic control signal devices and pedestrian control signals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic and Pedestrian Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-11-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1371 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3160756Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback