FL S1000 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying limitations and prohibitions on municipalities and counties relating to registrations and renewals of communications service providers; prohibiting certain municipalities and counties from electing to impose permit fees; revising items over which municipalities and counties may not exercise regulatory control, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#331 (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 96 NAYS 16
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 3
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-02SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-28SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-03-14SenateRemaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H693 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback