FL S0998 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a board of county commissioners to approve development of affordable housing on any parcel zoned for residential, commercial, or industrial use; requiring counties, municipalities, and special districts to include certain data relating to impact fees in their annual financial reports; revising applicable standards for the repair and remodeling of mobile and manufactured homes; authorizing the preclusion of an applicant or affiliate of an applicant from participation in Florida Housing Finance Corporation programs under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-04SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-01-16SenateRemaining references corrected to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-01-16SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-11-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S818 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
H775 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
S1022 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16331771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16331801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16604151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3208232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723078Amended CodeSee Bill Text
723079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7231255Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback