FL S0996 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring school districts to provide instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) and the use of an automated external defibrillator; requiring students to study and practice psychomotor skills associated with CPR at least once before graduating from high school, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2018-01-29SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-11-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H795 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003453Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003457Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback