FL S0990 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the fieldwork experience requirement for certain persons to take the examination for licensure as an occupational therapist; authorizing licensed occupational therapists to use a specified title and initials; prohibiting certain persons from using a specified title and initials; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Occupational Therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/24/21, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-03-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/21, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H543 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |